Multiplication by 11


Multiplication by 11 is easy! To multiply by a 2-digit number add the two digits and place the sum in between!

25 x 11 = 275
31 x 11 = 341
57 x 11 = 627 <– you need to carry the 1!What about a 3-digit number? Can you figure out what’s going on here?

253 x 11 = 2783
117 x 11 = 1287
532 x 11 = 5852

267 x 11 = 2937

Remember to carry if necessary. So 267 x 11 starts with a 2 (like 267 does), the next digit is 2+6=8, the next digit is 6+7=13 (oops! carry the 1 back to the previous digit, leaving a 3 in this place), then the last digit is 7 (just like 267 has). Thus the product is 2937.

Advertisements

3 Comments Add yours

  1. mini says:

    its a simple process which i already know ,thanks agail to recall me

  2. deepika says:

    hi,it is a nice trick and so easy to solve also it can save time in competitive exams thanks.

  3. Thats a nice trick. I knew the 2 digits trick, and now I know the three digit one! Thanks!

Leave a Reply

Fill in your details below or click an icon to log in:

WordPress.com Logo

You are commenting using your WordPress.com account. Log Out / Change )

Twitter picture

You are commenting using your Twitter account. Log Out / Change )

Facebook photo

You are commenting using your Facebook account. Log Out / Change )

Google+ photo

You are commenting using your Google+ account. Log Out / Change )

Connecting to %s